Wikipedia

Search results

Search This Blog

Showing posts with label multiplication of two digit numbers. Show all posts
Showing posts with label multiplication of two digit numbers. Show all posts

Thursday, October 22, 2020

Multiplication of two digit numbers - Edu brilliance tips

Multiplication of  two-digit numbers - Math's tricks

The teacher is a basic source of knowledge because each pupil can inculcate knowledge from them when they step into schools. So the teacher has the ability to make pupils sustainable. The teacher/Professor has to do more attempts to create some knowledgeable skills to answer questions easily within a fraction of seconds. 

Discussion with a friend to solve problems

Today we discuss some problems with the multiplication of two numbers.

1. 72×78 =?

Solution:  I step:  Multiply the unit number of LHS with the unit place digit/number of RHS.

                                       ↓       ↓

                              i.e. 72 ×78 = __ 1 6

                 

                  II Step: Multiply the ten's place digit of LHS with that next number like if 2 then multiply 2 with 3, 3 with 4, and so on.

                    ex: 2×3=6, 3×4=12, and so on

In this given problem 7 is in ten's place. So Multiply 7 with 8. Write this answer in a hundred places.

                      ⤤   

                      72×78 = 56 1 6

Any confusion here to understand the concept then Click here to watch the video.

2.  62× 68 = 42 1 6,  Apply the above steps to get an answer within 5 seconds.

3. 12×92 =?

Solution  I step:  Here, in-unit place, each number is the same in LHS and RHS as well. Multiply each unit number.

                        ↓      ↓

                     12×92 = __ 0 4

           II step:  Multiply each side ten's place digit number for that hailing answer add unit place number, then write that answer in a hundred places.

                    ↓      ↓

                    12×92 = __ 0 4

              i.e, 1×9 = 9, 9+2=11

            ⇒   12×92 = 11 0 4

Any confusion here to understand the concept then Click here to watch the video.

4. 34×74 = 24 1 6

5. 56×79 =?

Solution:  I step: Multiply each unit number and write only unit place digit at the unit place and tens place number should be kept carry.

                               ↓       ↓           5

                  i.e,   56 × 79 = __ __ 4


           II step: Multiply each ten's place digit number and write the answer in a hundred places.

                          ↓      ↓                  5

                 i.e.  56 × 79 = 35 __ 4

         III step: Multiply LHS of unit place digit with RHS of ten's place digit then multiply LHS of ten's place digit with RHS of unit place digit. Add both hailing answers write in ten's place at the answer.

                         ↓      ↓             5                        ↓           ↓

               i.e, 56 × 79 =35 __ 4                    56 × 79 =35 __ 4   

           ⇒   6×7 = 42,                               ⇒   5×9 = 45

            ⇒ 42+45 = 87

          IV step:  Write unit place digit of the hailing answer at ten's place and ten's place digit of hailing answer kept as carrying on a hundred places of an answer, then add an entire answer.

                                               8 5

             i.e. 56 × 79 = + 35 7 4 

                                       =   44 2 4

                  ⇒ 56 × 79 = 4424

6.   38 × 46 = 1748

You can watch videos to understand concepts thoroughly. Click here👇. You can click this link to get problems related to it. 

For more videos Subscribe to our channel then press the bell icon to get notifications of the latest videos. 

Feel free to ask questions and Any suggestions you would like to give me comment in the comment section. 


Intellectual Skills

Thanks for visiting my website.




Subscribe